CT SJ00018 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Stephen V. Prostor Of New Canaan To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Stephen V. Prostor Of New Canaan To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 5 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-01-30 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-01-30 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-01-30 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 4 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/24 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |