CT SJ00004 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Donald Defronzo Of New Britain To Be A Member And Chairperson Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Lottery Corporation.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Donald Defronzo Of New Britain To Be A Member And Chairperson Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Lottery Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 3 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 17 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 3 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |