CT SB01502 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-14 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2019, Making Appropriations Therefor, Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State And Implementing Provisions Of The Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2019, Making Appropriations Therefor, Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State And Implementing Provisions Of The Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 413 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 126 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 468 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-14HouseSenate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
2017-11-14HouseMotion Failed ()
2017-11-14HouseMOTION TO RECONSIDER
2017-11-09HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-11-03HousePublic Act 17-2
2017-10-31HouseLine Item Vetoed by the Governor, Section(s): Sec. 1. Line T411, Pg. 13
2017-10-31HouseSigned by Governor in Original
2017-10-26HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2017-10-26HouseIn Concurrence
2017-10-26HouseHouse Passed
2017-10-25HouseImmediate Transmittal to the House
2017-10-25SenateSenate Passed
2017-10-25SenateEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback