CT SB01501 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Concerning Zero Carbon Solicitation And Procurement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Zero Carbon Solicitation And Procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 414 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD A (Y: 55 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-10-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 415 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD B (Y: 53 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-10-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 416 AS AMENDED (Y: 75 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 465 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-11-03HousePublic Act 17-3
2017-10-31HouseSigned by Governor in Original
2017-10-26HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2017-10-26HouseIn Concurrence
2017-10-26HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-10-26HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10101
2017-10-26HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10103
2017-10-26HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-09-15HouseImmediate Transmittal to the House
2017-09-15SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-09-15SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10080
2017-09-15SenateEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback