CT SB01210 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 392 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 93 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 444 ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-07-25HousePublic Act 19-1
2019-07-23HouseSigned by Governor in Original
2019-07-22HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2019-07-22HouseIn Concurrence
2019-07-22HouseHouse Passed
2019-07-22HouseImmediate Transmittal to the House
2019-07-22SenateSenate Passed
2019-07-22SenateEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback