CT SB01207 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of Certain Parcels Of State Land In The Borough Of Naugatuck.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of Certain Parcels Of State Land In The Borough Of Naugatuck.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 441 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 391 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-07-25SenateSpecial Act 19-7
2019-07-23SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2019-07-22SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2019-07-22SenateIn Concurrence
2019-07-22SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-07-22SenateHouse Passed
2019-07-22SenateSenate Passed
2019-07-22SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-07-22SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-07-22SenateEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback