CT SB01186 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 629
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 629
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit the Office of Policy and Management to establish advisory boards for data governance, redefine executive branch agency, delete a requirement for an annual report concerning high value data and require records requests involving CP20 WIN be made to the originating agency.
Title
An Act Concerning Data Governance, Requests For Public Records Involving The Connecticut Preschool Through Twenty And Workforce Information Network And Approval Of A Sale Of Property By The Town Of Windham.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 629 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 359 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |