CT SB01162 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide extensions of time to file for certain property tax exemptions, to correct a property misclassification for two nonprofit entities and to request reconsideration of exemption amounts.
Title
An Act Concerning Filing Deadlines For Certain Property Tax Exemptions And Delays In Revaluation For Certain Towns, And Making A Technical Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 357 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 508 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 508 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-29 | Public Act 11-239 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Rules Suspended | |
2011-06-08 | House Calendar Number 639 | |
2011-06-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-08 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8705 | |
2011-05-05 | File Number 754 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 467 | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |