CT SB01160 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To study issues relating to school transportation; to require the Performance Evaluation Advisory Council to develop a model teacher performance evaluation system for use by local and regional boards of education and regional educational service centers; and to include employment in a cooperative arrangement as part of the definition of tenure for purposes of teacher tenure laws.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Statutes Regarding The Minimum Budget Requirement And Charter School Educator Permit.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Ackert [R] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | House Education Committee |
Sen. John Fonfara [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Rep. DebraLee Hovey [R] |
Sen. Edith Prague [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 500 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-29 | Public Act 11-234 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | House Calendar Number 637 | |
2011-06-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-07 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8628 | |
2011-05-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-18 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-04 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-13 | File Number 510 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Calendar Number 296 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-28 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |