CT SB01153 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to examine ways to allow an insured under a life insurance policy or a contract holder of an annuity to convert such policy or annuity to a long-term care policy.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Life Insurance Policy And Annuity Conversions And The Provision Of Certain Notifications By Life Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Joan Hartley [D] | House Insurance and Real Estate Committee |
Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Rep. Kelvin Roldan [D] | Rep. Elissa Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Special Act 11-13 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-24 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-18 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-13 | House Calendar Number 524 | |
2011-05-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-12 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 340 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |