CT SB01147 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect patient privacy by requiring a patient to opt-in to the exchange of electronic health records.
Title
An Act Concerning Patient Consent For The Exchange Of Electronic Health Information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-04-06 | File Number 429 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 247 | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |