CT SB01143 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require approval of revisions to the state's solid waste management plan and the Comprehensive Material's Management Strategy by the legislature's Environment Committee, prescribe certain signs concerning reverse vending machine outages and require the issuance of an RFI relating to the management of the state's solid waste stream.
Title
An Act Concerning Solid Waste Management Throughout The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 355 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Public Act 23-177 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2023-06-03 | House | House Calendar Number 633 |
2023-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-06-02 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | File Number 516 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 312 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |