CT SB01137 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the federal definition of "school-based health center" and to require the Commissioners of Public Health and Education to establish a plan for school-based health centers.
Title
An Act Concerning The School-based Health Center Advisory Committee And A Study On The Provision Of Behavioral Health Services At School-based Health Centers.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Theresa Gerratana [D] | Rep. Janice Giegler [R] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Rep. Michael Molgano [R] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 407 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-287 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 655 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7811 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2013-04-17 | Senate | File Number 545 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 400 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |