CT SB01135 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 902
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 902
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow municipalities to approve a lower interest rate applicable to delinquent property taxes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Municipal Interest Rate Applicable To Delinquent Property Taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | File Number 902 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 492 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/29 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |