CT SB01131 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand eligibility for and usage of the historic homes tax credit by (1) allowing homeowners to sell the credit to a business or apply it to the personal income tax, (2) lowering the minimum qualifying expense to fifteen thousand dollars, (3) raising the maximum amount of the credit to fifty thousand dollars per unit, (4) removing the geographical restriction on eligibility, and (5) introducing a graduated structure for the calculation of the credit amount.
Title
An Act Concerning Changes To The Connecticut Historic Home Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 422 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 297 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 297 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 13-266 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House Calendar Number 615 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | File Number 713 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 527 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |