CT SB01124 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To review the programs and services administered or provided by state agencies providing public health, mental health or developmental services.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenditures Of State Agencies Providing Public Health, Mental Health And Developmental Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | File Number 779 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 456 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/21 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |