CT SB01110 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish exempt registrant capabilities for sponsoring and bonding of mortgage loan originators; establish required surety bond amounts; clarify licensure requirements for loan processors and underwriters and create exempt registrant sponsorship capability for such loan processor and underwriters; clarify applicability of mortgage loan originator licensure requirements to individuals renegotiating or offering to renegotiate the terms of residential mortgage loans on behalf of mortgagors and create an obligation and a capability for such individuals to be licensed and bonded as mortgage loan originators; to amend the application requirements for various types of consumer credit licenses to require an applicant to provide the complete history of criminal convictions of the applicant and authorize the Banking Commissioner to conduct a state and federal criminal history records check of such persons and certain other related persons of such applicant; and to authorize the commissioner to deny an application for a license if the applicant or certain other related persons of such applicant have been convicted of any misdemeanor involving any aspect of the business for which a license is being sought, or any felony.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumer Credit Licenses And The Connecticut Uniform Securities Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-216 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-26 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-18 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-18 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-12 | House Calendar Number 503 | |
2011-05-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-29 | File Number 252 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 177 | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |