CT SB01109 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) clarify the authority of the Banking Commissioner to take certain actions jointly with federal regulators, (2) permit persons who obtain conditional preliminary approval to organize an expedited Connecticut bank to organize more than one such bank, (3) ensure that Connecticut banks obtain the approval of the Commissioner before acquiring a controlling interest in certain entities, (4) enhance the protections for public deposits, (5) clarify the lending authority of Connecticut credit unions, and (6) authorize Connecticut banks to merge with their nonbank affiliates.
Title
An Act Concerning Banks.
Sponsors
House Banks Committee | Rep. David Baram [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Rep. Marie Kirkley-Bey [D] |
Sen. Gary LeBeau [D] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Rep. William Tong [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 264 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-07 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-07 | Public Act 11-50 | |
2011-06-02 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-02 | House Passed | |
2011-04-28 | House Calendar Number 406 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 211 | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Calendar Number 160 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |