CT SB01097 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require that state grants for vocational-agricultural schools be made within available appropriations, (2) prohibit the supplanting of vocational-agricultural school funding in fiscal year 2016, and (3) allow the Department of Education to grant local or regional boards of education additional sums from funds remaining in the appropriation for transportation services.
Title
An Act Concerning State Funding For Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-13 | Senate | File Number 619 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 333 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |