CT SB01085 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit out-of-pocket expenses for an insured for any additional colonoscopy ordered in a policy year by an insured's physician.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Colonoscopies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | File Number 136 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Calendar Number 128 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |