CT SB01073 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - House Calendar Number 606
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - House Calendar Number 606
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of state agency policies and programs to assess the equity of state government programs and the allocation of state resources.
Title
An Act Concerning Equity And Opportunity In State Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | House Calendar Number 606 |
2021-06-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10430 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10052 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 524 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 305 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |