CT SB01060 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require nursing homes, home health care agencies and homemaker-home health aide agencies to maintain professional liability insurance at certain prescribed levels.
Title
An Act Concerning The Maintenance Of Professional Liability Insurance By Nursing Homes, Home Health Care Agencies And Homemaker-home Health Aide Agencies.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 416 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 347 PASS (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 347 PASS (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 13-249 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Calendar Number 643 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | File Number 646 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 474 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |