CT SB01054 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - House Calendar Number 687
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - House Calendar Number 687
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that annual adjustments to assessment rates pursuant to section 12-62r of the general statutes are done correctly.
Title
An Act Concerning Annual Adjustments To Assessment Rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 552 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 687 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-16 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 380 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |