CT SB01049 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - File Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - File Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) municipal housing authorities to post the value of housing choice vouchers and rules concerning such vouchers on their Internet web site, and (2) the Department of Housing to adopt regulations to establish a state-wide wait list for housing choice vouchers.
Title
An Act Concerning Payment Standards And Applications For The Federal Housing Choice Voucher Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | File Number 150 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 115 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |