CT SB01049 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 763
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 763
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Secretary of the State to develop a system through which election-related forms can be signed electronically, (2) require the Secretary to develop an online system for the registration of circulators of absentee ballots, (3) require that certain disputes concerning elections or primaries be adjudicated by the superior court for the judicial district of Hartford, (4) permit candidates or their agents to amend certain election-related filings to correct errors or omissions without penalty if done so within specified timeframes, (5) require registrars of voters to certify certain information regarding designated locations for election day registration, permit the Secretary to order any changes deemed necessary for the effective conduct of election day registration and eliminate the requirement to perform a cross-check before admitting an applicant for election day registration, and (6) permit the Secretary to use redistricting plan data to require registrars of voters to effectively implement such redistricting plan.
Title
An Act Concerning Modern Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | File Number 763 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 366 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |