CT SB01049 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize municipalities to enact ordinances that address blighted commercial property.
Title
An Act Concerning The Middlesex County Revitalization Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Special Act 13-8 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House Calendar Number 560 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | File Number 564 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 413 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |