CT SB01044 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require employers whose wages cause employees to rely on public assistance to contribute to state costs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recoupment Of State Costs Attributable To Low Wage Employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 344 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 236 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |