CT SB01043 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise, update and reorganize the laws concerning access to the Department of Children and Families' confidential records.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Records Of The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 490 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 490 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-167 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-06-07 | House Calendar Number 635 | |
2011-06-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-07 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-04-27 | File Number 637 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Calendar Number 399 | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |