CT SB01031 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a means and incentive for commercial applicators of sodium chloride to responsibly utilize such product to mitigate ice and snow accumulations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Sodium Chloride To Mitigate Ice And Snow Accumulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 458 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 265 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |