CT SB01030 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To shorten the audit period for the transfer of hazardous waste establishments from three years to sixty days.
Title
An Act Concerning The Transfer Of Hazardous Waste Establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public Act 19-75 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 681 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9793 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 237 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 108 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |