CT SB01027 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to issue a report on the Department of Economic and Community Development's progress in entering into a public-private partnership with the Connecticut Economic Resource Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Connecticut Economic Resource Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback