CT SB01027 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the disclosure and itemization of all contributions, regardless of amount, to certain candidate and exploratory committees, certain political committees and all party committees.
Title
An Act Concerning Campaign Finance Disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 623 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 316 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |