CT SB01026 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - House Calendar Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - House Calendar Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require risk retention groups to adopt governance standards and to authorize the Insurance Commissioner to examine any documents or material related to such requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Regulation Of Risk Retention Groups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 241 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 623 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 272 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 195 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |