CT SB01020 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require that the Commissioner of Environmental Protection adopt certain regulations in concurrence with the Departments of Public Health, Economic and Community Development and Agriculture and to prevent certain economic development efforts from being affected by regulations concerning public water supplies.
Title
An Act Concerning Water Resources And Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |
2011-05-05 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 168 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 135 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |