CT SB01009 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Police Officer Standards and Training Council to develop a model social media policy for police departments and to require police departments to adopt such model policy or a policy with higher standards.
Title
An Act Requiring Social Media Policies For Police Departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 294 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 200 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |