CT SB01004 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage the exportation of the products and services of Connecticut businesses by establishing a preference in the Small Business Express application process for businesses that are attempting to enter foreign markets.
Title
An Act Encouraging The Exportation Of State Products And Services Through The Small Business Express Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 13-56 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 387 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5888 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | File Number 156 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 156 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |