CT SB01003 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) make technical and other changes to the statute permitting state action to abate public nuisance; (2) provide for the use of electronic signatures in certain reports; (3) ensure that all law enforcement professionals who work for the state or a municipality are covered for purposes of indemnification; (4) make restitution orders in criminal cases enforceable for the same duration as in civil matters; (5) provide for criminal lockout protection to tenants of nonresidential properties; (6) provide an enhanced penalty for victims of larceny who have been deemed incapable by the probate court; (7) correct statutory citations; (8) update the purpose of the eyewitness identification task force to include emerging technologies; and (9) repeal a reporting requirement duplicative of the reporting requirement of section 17b-99b of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Various Statutes Concerning The Criminal Justice System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 348 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 17-87 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 486 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | File Number 676 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 358 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |