CT SB01002 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - House Calendar Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - House Calendar Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study best practices concerning the role of senior centers, municipal agents and other municipal stakeholders in providing senior citizens with access to health care, services and related information.
Title
An Act Concerning Senior Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 342 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 675 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6605 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-23 | Senate | File Number 157 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 145 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |