CT SB00991 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To make revisions to a statute concerning the State Marshal Commission; change the deadline for municipalities to notify the Department of Administrative Services of their interest in purchasing surplus real property; permit the department to determine the best method of disposing of such property, including offering it to abutting landowners; expand the department's authority to grant easements; expand the existing exemption from certain emission, gas mileage and other standards for state fleet vehicles to include all emergency vehicles; modify the threshold for separate specifications for classes of work; and make other minor revisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Department Of Administrative Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 459 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 375 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 460 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8436 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-26SenatePublic Act 17-243
2017-06-07SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateRules Suspended
2017-06-07SenateDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2017-06-07SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-06-07SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8802
2017-06-07SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-05SenateHouse Calendar Number 652
2017-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-05SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8436
2017-04-13SenateFile Number 620
2017-04-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 314
2017-04-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-04-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-07SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-24SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-09SenatePublic Hearing 03/13
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback