CT SB00989 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine "privatization contract" and "state contracting agency", modify the quorum requirement of the State Contracting Standards Board, impose additional requirements on proposed privatization contracts and require the Auditors of Public Accounts to issue compliance reports regarding staffing levels of the State Contracting Standards Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Contracting Standards Board And Requirements For Privatization Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 619 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 376 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Favorable |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion Failed SF |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |