CT SB00975 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To amend Department of Consumer Protection statutes to: (1) Remove a requirement that distributors of sealed tickets have a physical office in this state, (2) require charitable organizations to submit only one application to conduct bazaars and raffles and to ensure municipalities promptly receive such application fees, (3) promote safer conduct of golf ball-drop raffles, (4) clarify who is eligible to obtain a fire system layout technician's license without first having to obtain specific certification, (5) remove Home Improvement and New Home Guaranty Fund requirements requiring consumers to submit certified copies of court judgments and add clarifying language concerning court orders and decrees, (6) remove reciprocity language concerning real estate appraisers that does not comply with federal guidelines, and (7) increase the amount of restitution consumers may receive under the Connecticut Unfair Trade Practices Act from five thousand to ten thousand dollars.
Title
An Act Making Minor And Technical Changes To Department Of Consumer Protection Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public Act 15-60 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 516 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6283 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 340 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 234 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |