CT SB00973 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide guidelines and standards for the Department of Social Services' determination of undue hardship for purposes of Medicaid eligibility.
Title
An Act Concerning The Determination Of Undue Hardship For Purposes Of Medicaid Eligibility And Disability Determinations For Beneficiaries Of A Special Needs Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-176 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-05 | House Calendar Number 616 | |
2011-06-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-03 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8237 | |
2011-06-02 | Matter Pass Retained | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8088 | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 331 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 222 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |