CT SB00961 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make various changes to the statutes concerning municipal electric utilities and municipal electric energy cooperatives.
Title
An Act Concerning The Audit Of Municipal Electric Energy Cooperatives By The Auditors Of Public Accounts, The Municipal Electric Consumer Advocate And Recommendations From A Municipal Electric Energy Cooperative Forensic Examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 454 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 206 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |