CT SB00933 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a cybersecurity task force.
Title
An Act Establishing A Cybersecurity Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 119 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 119 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Special Act 23-23 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | House Calendar Number 482 |
2023-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | File Number 339 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 199 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |