CT SB00930 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 322
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a pilot program that authorizes the Commissioner of Early Childhood to issue a license to a person or group of persons to operate a family child care home or group child care home in a space that is not a private home and which has been provided by an association, organization, corporation, institution or agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Creation Of A Pilot Program For An Early Childhood Business Incubator Model.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 322
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 148
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback