CT SB00928 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit the recovery of reasonable attorney's fees in successful actions for wrongful property tax assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Tax Exemption For Real Property Used For Certain Purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-14SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 725
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 351
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback