CT SB00921 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To update the general statutes to reflect the current scope of practice of advanced practice registered nurses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Scope Of Practice Of Advanced Practice Registered Nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 469
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 594
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 300
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback