CT SB00921 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a state health insurance exchange pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
An Act Establishing A State Health Insurance Exchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 280 AS AMENDED (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7830 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7830 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-08 | Public Act 11-53 | |
2011-06-04 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-04 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8359 | |
2011-06-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-01 | House Calendar Number 576 | |
2011-06-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7830 | |
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-26 | File Number 626 | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Calendar Number 385 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |