CT SB00910 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide immunity from civil liability to a physician who accompanies and assists a state, regional or municipal SWAT team.
Title
An Act Providing Immunity From Civil Liability To A Physician Who Accompanies And Assists A State, Regional Or Municipal Swat Team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 837 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 438 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |