CT SB00897 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - File Number 441
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - File Number 441
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand eligibility for absentee ballot voting to any elector who is absent from his or her town of voting residence for any reason and at any time during the hours of voting at an election, primary or referendum.
Title
An Act Concerning Eligibility For Electors To Vote By Absentee Ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | File Number 441 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 306 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Motion Failed SF |
2017-03-17 | Senate | House Favorable |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |